This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 22:43:31 (UTC).

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A A O AMICAR ABDIEL PADILLA V. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A A O AMICAR ABDIEL PADILLA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A A O AMICAR ABDIEL PADILLA

AMICAR ABDIEL PADILLA

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONALD J MASTEN

Po Box 4449

Orlando, FL 32802

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER J MARTIN

Law Offices Of Robert J Smith 390 N Orange Ave Ste 895

Orlando, FL 32801-1635

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

02/12/2020 : ORDER OF DISMISSAL

MOTION TO COMPEL

01/28/2020 : MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/28/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/27/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/27/2020 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/24/2020 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/24/2020 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

REPLY BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/24/2020 : REPLY BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

01/24/2020 : MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/25/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/25/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/25/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/25/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/25/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/25/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/25/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/25/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/25/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Docket Type: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Description: w/o prej (nunc pro tunc 12-31-2019) Instrument: 2020032353 Book: 7815 Page: 325

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Docket Type: MOTION TO COMPEL; Description: Production or Motion in Limine and Motion for Sanctions by Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: (2nd)to Allstate Insurance Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: (2nd) to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Apex Auto Glass LLC etc to deem req for admissions admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Apex Auto Glass LLC to deft's Request for Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc to deny deft's Motion to Dismiss & Request for Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: REPLY BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Apex Auto Glass LLC to Motion for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: (Partial)by Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: MOTION TO STRIKE; Description: deft's demand for appraisal and motion for confession of jugment by Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (reimbursement) to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (agent pricing) to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (safelite) to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (third party software programs utilized) to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (claims procedure) to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (initial) to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Donald J Masten

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less