This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 13:37:38 (UTC).

AMOENA REALTY LTD DBA GOLFVIEW APARTMENTS V. LORRAINE TOOLE

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 AMOENA REALTY LTD DBA GOLFVIEW APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LORRAINE TOOLE. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Kelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAW OFFICES OF JAMES I BARRON III PA

AMOENA REALTY LTD DBA GOLFVIEW APARTMENTS

Defendant

LORRAINE TOOLE

Not Classified By Court

GOLFVIEW APARTMENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES I BARRON III

Attorney at JAMES I BARRON III PA

121 S Orange Ave Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/07/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/07/2020 : COMPLAINT

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/07/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

01/07/2020 : DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

01/08/2020 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/15/2020 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/16/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

01/24/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/24/2020 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

01/28/2020 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

01/30/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

01/30/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

01/30/2020 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/30/2020 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DEFAULT

02/04/2020 : DEFAULT

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

02/10/2020 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: agst Lorraine Toole Instrument: 2020030608 Book: 7814 Page: 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Lorraine Toole

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Lorraine Toole w/prop default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Lorraine Toole

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE; Description: (posted) exec Lorraine Toole

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: Court reviewed dfnt answer; Response filed by Non-Party to action - No Further action may be taken by the court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Jaimie Toole and Request for Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (5-posted) Lorraine Toole

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: of complaint & summons to Lorraine Toole

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To LORRAINE TOOLE fwd to pltf's atty & process server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: DIRECTIONS TO CLERK; Description: by Law Offices of James I. Barron, III P.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Amoena Realty LTD etc w/ prop order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT; Description: possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMOENA REALTY LTD DBA GOLFVIEW APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRON JAMES I III