This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 12/11/2022 at 07:00:04 (UTC).

AMAURY ALONZO V. VPNE PARKING SOLUTIONS LLC A FOREIGN CORP

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 AMAURY ALONZO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VPNE PARKING SOLUTIONS LLC A FOREIGN CORP. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMAURY ALONZO

Defendant

VPNE PARKING SOLUTIONS LLC A FOREIGN CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

NICOLE DELAWARE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

07/01/2022 : NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

07/13/2022 : MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

07/22/2022 : NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

05/17/2022 : ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL

08/24/2022 : PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

07/01/2022 : NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/01/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

11/22/2022 : ORDER OF DISMISSAL

MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

07/22/2022 : MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej Instrument: 2022268352 Book: 8342 Page: 585 View: 2022268352

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL; Description: stip for voluntary dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: reset per docket 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: ORDER DIRECTING; Description: on notice of settlement and directing parties to file paperwork to resolve and close this matter within 30 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING; Description: pretrial conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Description: by VPNE Parking Solutions LLC, etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: joint, pretrial conference w/proposed order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: (Stip)Trial by all parties w/attch'd prop Order *efiled through portal,nothing to be done

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: ALIAS To VPNE PARKING SOLUTIONS, LLC, A FOREIGN CORP. Fwd to pltf's via e-service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS; Description: (ALIAS) To VPNE Parking Solutions, LLC, A foreign Corp.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: for service of process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To VPNE PARKING SOLUTIONS, LLC, A FOREIGN CORP. Frwd to Pltf via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less