Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/15/2020 at 13:05:35 (UTC).

ALBA R CASTRO, ET AL V. FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 ALBA R CASTRO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JUSTO E VALLES

MARIN ELJAIEK LOPEZ & MARTINEZ PL

ALBA R CASTRO

Defendant

FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOE DE PRADO

Attorney at MARIN ELJAIEK LOPEZ & MARTINEZ P L

2601 S Bayshore Dr 18Th Floor

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Defendant Attorney

C DEWITT REVELS

Attorney at WALKER REVELS GRENINGER & NETCHER PLLC

189 S Orange Ave Ste 1830

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE

03/13/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

03/13/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

03/02/2020 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/13/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

01/27/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

12/19/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/18/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/18/2019 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/18/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/18/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

12/18/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/18/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: unverified answers to interrogs by Family Security Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Family Security Ins Co to request for production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Family Security Insurance Company Inc w/affirm defenses and demand for jury trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of C Dewitt Revels III, Esq obo Family Security Insurance Company Inc w/designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: CFO obo Family Security Ins Co Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: to Family Security Insurance Company, fwd to pltfs atty by mail for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Family Security Insurance Company, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Alba R Castro et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Family Security Insurance Company, Inc by Alba R Castro et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Family Security Insurance Company, Inc by Alba R Castro et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARIN ELJAIEK LOPEZ & MARTINEZ P L is a litigant

Latest cases where FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Recels, Claude DeWitt