Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/14/2020 at 11:06:38 (UTC).

ABELARDO FERREIRA V. JOANNE FERREIRA

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 ABELARDO FERREIRA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOANNE FERREIRA. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Stasia Warren. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Stasia Warren

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ABELARDO FERREIRA

Respondent

JOANNE FERREIRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JILL FOWLER

6996 Piazza Grande Ave Suite 311

Orlando, FL 32835

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Stasia Warren; Location: CI-11, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Description: Instrument: 2020052499 Book: 7828 Page: 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: proof of residency by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SEC NUMBER; Description: Joanna Ferreira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ANSWER AND WAIVER; Description: by Joanne Ferreira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 408.00; Final Amount: 408.00; Credits: -408.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: to Atty Fowler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE DIST PARENTING NOTICE/STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SEC NUMBER; Description: Abelardo Ferreira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: by Atty Fowler obo Abelardo Ferreira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JILL FOWLER