Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 11/13/2020 at 23:10:13 (UTC).

AARON C GILLIS V. FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 AARON C GILLIS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAN NEWLIN & PARTNERS

AARON C GILLIS

Defendant

FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL H KESTENBAUM

Dan Newlin & Partners 7335 W Sand Lake Rd Ste 300

Orlando, FL 32819

Defendant Attorney

CHOBEE EBBETS

Attorney at CHOBEE EBBETS PA

138 Live Oak Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/23/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/16/2020 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/23/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

06/26/2020 : NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

05/08/2020 : NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

03/26/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE

03/26/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

12/24/2019 : NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/23/2019 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/23/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/23/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/23/2019 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/23/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/20/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/20/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/20/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT

11/20/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/20/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: (video) Aaron C Gillis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Aaron C Gillis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: (amd video) of Aaron C Gillis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: to Orlando Regional Medical Center - Records Custodian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Aaron C Gillis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: to Custodian of Records for Walgreens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Aaron Gillis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: to UnitedHealthcare Appeals et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Aaron C Gillis to req for production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of ans to interrogs by Aaron C Gillis

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Florida Farm Bureau General Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION fwd to pltfs atty via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Florida Farm Bureau General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to FLorida Farm Bureau General Ins Co by Aaron C Gillis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to FLorida Farm Bureau General Ins Co by Aaron C Gillis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to FLorida Farm Bureau General Ins Co by Aaron C Gillis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAN NEWLIN & PARTNERS is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Farm Bureau General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KESTENBAUM MICHAEL H