This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/06/2023 at 07:47:07 (UTC).

2018-3 IH BORROWER LP V. LINDSAY BRINKMANN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 2018-3 IH BORROWER LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LINDSAY BRINKMANN,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

2018-3 IH BORROWER LP

MGFD LAW FIRM PA

Clearwater, FL 33761

Defendants

LINDSAY BRINKMANN

Deltona, FL 32738

FRANK PERKOWSKI

Deltona, FL 32738

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW E SIEGEL

Attorney at THE MGFD LAW FIRM PA

2753 Sr 580 Ste 209

Clearwater, FL 33761

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/13/2023 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

01/13/2023 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/13/2023 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/13/2023 : REQUEST SUMMONS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

01/13/2023 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

01/13/2023 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/01/2023 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

02/06/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

02/06/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

02/14/2023 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

02/14/2023 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

02/14/2023 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

02/14/2023 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

DEFAULT

02/23/2023 : DEFAULT

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

02/27/2023 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: agst Lindsay Brinkman & Frank Perkowski Instrument: 2023043103 Book: 8375 Page: 177 View: 2023043103

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Lindsay Brinkmann and Frank Perkowski

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: (verification) as to Lindsay Brinkmann and Frank Perkowski

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by 2018 3 IH Borrower LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Lindsay Brinkmann et al w/prop default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (5)Peter Perkowski

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (5)Lindsay Brinkmann

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: of Copy of Summons & Complaint to Lindsay Brinkmann and Frank Perkowski

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To FRANK PERKOWSKI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To LINDSAY BRINKMANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Frank Perkowski

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Lindsay Brinkmann

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less