***********CODL
01/23/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Property - Residential Eviction
Volusia, Florida
Angela A. Dempsey
2018-3 IH BORROWER LP
MGFD LAW FIRM PA
HARLEY COATE
ERIC PUSKARIC
REBECCA PUSKARIC
MATTHEW E SIEGEL
02/16/2023 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT
02/16/2023 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT
02/16/2023 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR DEFAULT
02/15/2023 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)
02/06/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED
02/06/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED
02/06/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED
02/06/2023 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
02/06/2023 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
02/06/2023 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
01/24/2023 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS
01/24/2023 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS
01/24/2023 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS
01/23/2023 : REQUEST SUMMONS
01/23/2023 : REQUEST SUMMONS
01/23/2023 : REQUEST SUMMONS
01/23/2023 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION
01/23/2023 : CIVIL COVER SHEET
Docket(#21); Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by 2018-3 IH Borrower LP
[-] Read LessDocket(#20); Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Harley Coate, Eric Puskaric and Rebecca Puskaric w/prop default (Clerk cannot enter default - Stip filed)
[-] Read LessDocket(#19); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: (verification) and non military service as to Harley Coate, Eric Puskaric and Rebecca Puskaric
[-] Read LessDocket(#18); Docket Type: COPY; Description: sheriff's return of service as to Rebecca Puskaric
[-] Read LessDocket(#17); Docket Type: COPY; Description: sheriff's return of service as to Eric Puskaric
[-] Read LessDocket(#16); Docket Type: COPY; Description: sheriff's return of service as to Harley Coate
[-] Read LessDocket(#15); Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Harley Coate, Eric Puskaric and Rebecca Puskaric Instrument: 2023038733 Book: 8372 Page: 3228 View: 2023038733
[-] Read LessDocket(#14); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (posted) Rebecca Puskaric
[-] Read LessDocket(#13); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (posted) Eric Puskaric
[-] Read LessDocket(#12); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (posted) Harley Coate
[-] Read LessFinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialQuantity: 3; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 30.00; Credits: -30.00; Balance: 0.00
[-] Read LessDocket(#8); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To REBECCA PUSKARIC
[-] Read LessDocket(#7); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ERIC PUSKARIC
[-] Read LessDocket(#6); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To HARLEY COATE
[-] Read LessDocket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Eric Puskaric
[-] Read LessDocket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Rebecca Puskaric
[-] Read LessDocket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Harley Coate
[-] Read LessDocket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession
[-] Read LessDocket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET
[-] Read Less