This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/29/2023 at 19:00:55 (UTC).

2018-3 IH BORROWER LP V. HARLEY COATE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 2018-3 IH BORROWER LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HARLEY COATE,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

2018-3 IH BORROWER LP

MGFD LAW FIRM PA

Defendants

HARLEY COATE

ERIC PUSKARIC

REBECCA PUSKARIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW E SIEGEL

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

02/16/2023 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

02/16/2023 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR DEFAULT

02/16/2023 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR DEFAULT

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

02/15/2023 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

02/06/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

02/06/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

02/06/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/06/2023 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/06/2023 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/06/2023 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

01/24/2023 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

01/24/2023 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

01/24/2023 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/23/2023 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/23/2023 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/23/2023 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

01/23/2023 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/23/2023 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by 2018-3 IH Borrower LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Harley Coate, Eric Puskaric and Rebecca Puskaric w/prop default (Clerk cannot enter default - Stip filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: (verification) and non military service as to Harley Coate, Eric Puskaric and Rebecca Puskaric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: COPY; Description: sheriff's return of service as to Rebecca Puskaric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: COPY; Description: sheriff's return of service as to Eric Puskaric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: COPY; Description: sheriff's return of service as to Harley Coate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Harley Coate, Eric Puskaric and Rebecca Puskaric Instrument: 2023038733 Book: 8372 Page: 3228 View: 2023038733

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (posted) Rebecca Puskaric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (posted) Eric Puskaric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (posted) Harley Coate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 3; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 30.00; Credits: -30.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To REBECCA PUSKARIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ERIC PUSKARIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To HARLEY COATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Eric Puskaric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Rebecca Puskaric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Harley Coate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less