This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/20/2022 at 13:35:32 (UTC).

2017 1 IH BORROWER LP V. KATHY DODSON, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 2017 1 IH BORROWER LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KATHY DODSON,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A. Sanders, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A. Sanders, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

2017 1 IH BORROWER LP

MGFD LAW FIRM PA

Clearwater, FL 33761

Defendants

KATHY DODSON

Deltona, FL 32725

JOANN DOWELL

Deltona, FL 32725

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW E SIEGEL

Attorney at THE MGFD LAW FIRM PA

2753 Sr 580 Ste 209

Clearwater, FL 33761

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/20/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

04/20/2022 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/20/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

04/20/2022 : DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

04/20/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/20/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

04/20/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

04/20/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

04/25/2022 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/29/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/29/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

05/05/2022 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

05/05/2022 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

05/11/2022 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: Instrument: 2022116778 Book: 8254 Page: 2250

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: 2017-1 IH Borrower LP for order approving stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Kathy Dodon et al Instrument: 2022110651 Book: 8251 Page: 462

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: summons and complaint to Joann Dowell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: summons and complaint to Kathy Dodson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To JOANN DOWELL rtn to proc serv(MAX)at front counter for sop, cc Ptf's Atty via e service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To KATHY DODSON rtn to proc serv(MAX)at front counter for sop, cc Ptf's Atty via e service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Kathy Dodson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by 2017-1 IH Borrower LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: DIRECTIONS TO CLERK; Description: from Michael Geo F Davis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Joann Dowell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MGFD LAW FIRM PA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIEGEL MATTHEW EDWARD