This case was last updated from Union County Courts on 07/15/2021 at 15:32:48 (UTC).

WS BADCOCK CORPORATION VS NORMAN, CASSANDRA

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 WS BADCOCK CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NORMAN, CASSANDRA. This case was filed in Union County Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID, BISHOP, MITCHELL and MITCHELL BISHOP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WS BADCOCK CORPORATION

Defendant

NORMAN, CASSANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIDD, EVAN D

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/16/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/16/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/16/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

06/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/05/2021 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 8/5/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 19098

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to WS BADCOCK CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCase 632021SC000106SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WS BADCOCK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIDD, EVAN D