This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 06/29/2019 at 15:31:20 (UTC).

STARKE HMA LLC DBA SHANDS STAR VS BROWN, TRISTON J

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 STARKE HMA LLC DBA SHANDS STAR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BROWN, TRISTON J. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL and MITCHELL BISHOP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STARKE HMA LLC DBA SHANDS STAR

Defendant

BROWN, TRISTON J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/05/2019:COMPLAINT

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/05/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRISTON J. BROWN

06/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRISTON J. BROWN

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

06/11/2019:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 7/18/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TRISTON J. BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 15347

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to STARKE HMA LLC DBA SHANDS STARKE REGIONAL MEDICAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketCase 632019SC000112SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/5/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 07/18/2019 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MX Room 208

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STARKE HMA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R