This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 02/01/2021 at 21:47:04 (UTC).

SHANDS HMA LLC DBA SHANDS STAR VS TOMLINSON, FLOYD W

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 SHANDS HMA LLC DBA SHANDS STAR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TOMLINSON, FLOYD W. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL, MITCHELL BISHOP and BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHANDS HMA LLC DBA SHANDS STAR

Defendant

TOMLINSON, FLOYD W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLINTON, J PAUL

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

09/24/2020:AFFIDAVIT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

09/24/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/24/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/24/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

09/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

RETURN OF SERVICE 10-21-2020

11/02/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE 10-21-2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/05/2020 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE 10-21-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 11/5/2020 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 17737

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to SHANDS HMA LLC DBA SHANDS STARKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase 632020SC000135SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHANDS HMA LLC DBA SHANDS STAR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLINTON, J PAUL ESQ