This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 11/22/2022 at 14:05:17 (UTC).

SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES VS PRESCOTT, JAMIE

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PRESCOTT, JAMIE. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID, BISHOP, MITCHELL and MITCHELL BISHOP. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES

Defendant

PRESCOTT, JAMIE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

10/25/2022:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

3 Day Notice

10/25/2022:3 Day Notice

COPY OF TENANT LEDGER

10/25/2022:COPY OF TENANT LEDGER

RESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

10/25/2022:RESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

LETTER RE LAST OPPORTUNITY TO PREVENT EVICTION

10/25/2022:LETTER RE LAST OPPORTUNITY TO PREVENT EVICTION

5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS

10/25/2022:5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS

NOTICE TO APPEAR

10/25/2022:NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR LINDSEY IMHOF

10/25/2022:NOTICE TO APPEAR LINDSEY IMHOF

RESPONSE FROM JAMIE PRESCOTT

10/31/2022:RESPONSE FROM JAMIE PRESCOTT

RETURN OF SERVICE 10-26-2022

11/03/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE 10-26-2022

RETURN OF SERVICE NTA 10-26-2022

11/03/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE NTA 10-26-2022

ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY

11/04/2022:ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY

JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

11/15/2022:JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

11/15/2022:WRIT OF POSSESSION

RETURN OF SERVICE WRIT OF POSSESSION POSTED

11/18/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE WRIT OF POSSESSION POSTED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE WRIT OF POSSESSION POSTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/14/2022 15:00; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Hearing; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketEvent Hearing scheduled on 11/14/2022 at 0300 PM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/03/2022 10:00; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Hearing; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE NTA 10-26-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE 10-26-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number MX 21724

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketActive Process Eviction Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketEvent Hearing scheduled on 11/3/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase 632022CC000209CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less