This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 06/16/2019 at 14:00:15 (UTC).

Santa Fe Mobile Homes VS GREEN, DONALD L Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 Santa Fe Mobile Homes filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GREEN, DONALD L. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL and MITCHELL BISHOP. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santa Fe Mobile Homes

Defendants

MORRIS, KARAH L

GREEN, DONALD L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

05/23/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

3 Day Notice

05/23/2019:3 Day Notice

RESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

05/23/2019:RESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS

05/23/2019:5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS

NOTICE TO APPEAR

05/23/2019:NOTICE TO APPEAR

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

06/03/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT

06/03/2019:DEFAULT

Return of Service Posted Residential 5-23-19

06/03/2019:Return of Service Posted Residential 5-23-19

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

06/03/2019:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

WRIT OF POSSESSION

06/03/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

06/06/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

WRIT OF POSSESSION POSTED 6-3-19

06/06/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION POSTED 6-3-19

RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

06/07/2019:RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

06/07/2019:RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

Final Judgment Eviction

06/11/2019:Final Judgment Eviction

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment Eviction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION POSTED 6-3-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Posted Residential 5-23-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 15250

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCase 632019CC000096CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 06/06/2019 10:45; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Hearing; Location: MX UNION COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES is a litigant