This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 11/15/2022 at 14:08:50 (UTC).

SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES VS FREIE, REBECCA

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FREIE, REBECCA. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL BISHOP, BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID and BISHOP, MITCHELL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MITCHELL BISHOP

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

BISHOP, MITCHELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES

Defendant

FREIE, REBECCA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

10/18/2022:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

NOTICE OF EVICTION

10/18/2022:NOTICE OF EVICTION

NOTICE OF FILING TENANT LEDGER

10/18/2022:NOTICE OF FILING TENANT LEDGER

5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS

10/18/2022:5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS

NOTICE TO APPEAR

10/18/2022:NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES

10/18/2022:NOTICE TO APPEAR SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES

RETURN OF SERVICE COUNT I - 10-20-2022

10/27/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE COUNT I - 10-20-2022

RETURN OF SERVICE NTA - 10-20-2022

10/27/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE NTA - 10-20-2022

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/28/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT

10/28/2022:DEFAULT

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

11/01/2022:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

WRIT OF POSSESSION

11/01/2022:WRIT OF POSSESSION

ORDER FOLLOLWING EVICTION HEARING

11/04/2022:ORDER FOLLOLWING EVICTION HEARING

RETURN OF SERVICE WOP

11/07/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE WOP

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE WOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOLLOLWING EVICTION HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/03/2022 10:00; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Hearing; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE NTA - 10-20-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE COUNT I - 10-20-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number MX 21690

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketActive Process Eviction Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketEvent Hearing scheduled on 11/3/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCase 632022CC000204CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less