This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 11/08/2022 at 14:01:30 (UTC).

SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES VS CARROLL, DANA Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARROLL, DANA. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID, BISHOP, MITCHELL and MITCHELL BISHOP. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES

Defendants

GOOD, CALVIN LEE

CARROLL, DANA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

10/11/2022:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

RESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

10/11/2022:RESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

3 Day Notice

10/11/2022:3 Day Notice

5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS

10/11/2022:5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS

NOTICE TO APPEAR DANA CARROLL AND CALVIN GOOD

10/11/2022:NOTICE TO APPEAR DANA CARROLL AND CALVIN GOOD

NOTICE TO APPEAR SANTA FE PARK

10/11/2022:NOTICE TO APPEAR SANTA FE PARK

RETURN OF SERVICE 10-12-2022

10/18/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE 10-12-2022

RETURN OF SERVICE 10-12-2022

10/18/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE 10-12-2022

RESPONSE FROM DANA CARROLL AND CALVIN GOOD

10/19/2022:RESPONSE FROM DANA CARROLL AND CALVIN GOOD

NOTICE OF CHANGE ADDRESS

10/20/2022:NOTICE OF CHANGE ADDRESS

FINAL JUDGMENT -DAMAGES

10/24/2022:FINAL JUDGMENT -DAMAGES

RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

10/31/2022:RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT -DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/20/2022 10:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Hearing; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE FROM DANA CARROLL AND CALVIN GOOD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE 10-12-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE 10-12-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR SANTA FE PARK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR DANA CARROLL AND CALVIN GOOD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number MX 21672

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketActive Process Eviction Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketEvent Hearing scheduled on 10/20/2022 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCase 632022CC000197CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less