This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 10/04/2022 at 14:10:05 (UTC).

SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES VS BRIGGS, ASHTON

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BRIGGS, ASHTON. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL BISHOP, BISHOP, MITCHELL and BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MITCHELL BISHOP

BISHOP, MITCHELL

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTA FE MOBILE HOMES

Defendant

BRIGGS, ASHTON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

09/06/2022:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

NOTICE OF EVICTION

09/06/2022:NOTICE OF EVICTION

RESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

09/06/2022:RESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS

09/06/2022:5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS

NOTICE TO APPEAR

09/06/2022:NOTICE TO APPEAR

RETURN OF SERVICE

09/15/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE NTA

09/15/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE NTA

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

09/16/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT

09/16/2022:DEFAULT

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT COUNT I

09/20/2022:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT COUNT I

WRIT OF POSSESSION

09/20/2022:WRIT OF POSSESSION

FINAL JUDGMENT- DAMAGES

09/22/2022:FINAL JUDGMENT- DAMAGES

RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

09/28/2022:RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

10/03/2022:RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/22/2022 10:00; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Hearing; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event Hearing on 9/22/2022 1000 AM Judge MITCHELL BISHOP results HELD on 9/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT COUNT I

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE NTA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketActive Process Eviction Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketEvent Hearing scheduled on 9/22/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase 632022CC000179CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less