This case was last updated from Union County Courts on 07/30/2021 at 16:08:33 (UTC).

ROTHENBERGER, REBECCA VS ROTHENBERGER, CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 ROTHENBERGER, REBECCA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROTHENBERGER, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Union County Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROEB, ROBERT KIRK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROTHENBERGER, REBECCA

Respondent

ROTHENBERGER, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MEADORS, MICHAEL JAY

Respondent Attorney

HERTZ, DARBY FITZGERALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $392.50 Receipt Number MX 19289

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $392.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $392.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketRespondent Attorney: DARBY HERTZ Assigned to CHRISTOPHER ROTHENBERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketHUSBAND'S ANSWER TO WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND HUSBANDS COUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FORMER HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 19202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to REBECCA ROTHENBERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase 632021DR000113DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/6/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL J MEADORS