This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 02/01/2021 at 21:47:18 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS LEE, DALTON

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LEE, DALTON. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL, MITCHELL BISHOP and BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

LEE, DALTON

Raiford, FL 32083

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, RACQUEL ANN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

09/22/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/22/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/22/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

09/22/2020:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

RETURN OF SERVICE 10-30-2020

11/02/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE 10-30-2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/05/2020 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE 10-30-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 11/5/2020 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 17730

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase 632020SC000134SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/22/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, RACQUEL ANN