This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 06/17/2019 at 15:31:29 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, VS ATHEY, CLINTON

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ATHEY, CLINTON. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL and MITCHELL BISHOP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,

Defendant

ATHEY, CLINTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/24/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/24/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CLINTON ATHEY

05/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CLINTON ATHEY

NOTICE OF FILING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

05/24/2019:NOTICE OF FILING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

05/24/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

05/24/2019:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 7/18/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 15293

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CLINTON ATHEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCase 632019SC000105SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 07/18/2019 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MX Room 208

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL, ESQ