This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 02/01/2021 at 21:46:51 (UTC).

PALERMO ASSOCIATES LLC AS SUCC VS JONES, KIMITHY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 PALERMO ASSOCIATES LLC AS SUCC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONES, KIMITHY. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL, BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID and MITCHELL BISHOP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

MITCHELL BISHOP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALERMO ASSOCIATES LLC AS SUCC

Defendant

JONES, KIMITHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPRECHMAN, STEVEN BRUCE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

09/28/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

COMPLAINT

09/28/2020:COMPLAINT

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/28/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

11/04/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

11/05/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

01/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/04/2021 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event Pre Trial Conference on 11/5/2020 0930 AM Judge MITCHELL BISHOP results Continued on 11/5/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 3/4/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 18172

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/05/2020 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 11/5/2020 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 17746

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to PALERMO ASSOCIATES LLC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase 632020SC000136SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALERMO ASSOCIATES LLC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO SUMMIT FINANCIAL CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sprechman, Steven B., ESQ.