Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Union County on 03/10/2021 at 15:06:07 (UTC).

MULLEN, KELLY-JO VS BRYANT, ROSANNA Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 MULLEN, KELLY-JO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BRYANT, ROSANNA. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Union County, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GROEB, ROBERT K and GROEB, ROBERT KIRK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Union County

  • Courthouse:

    Union County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GROEB, ROBERT K

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MULLEN, KELLY-JO

Defendants

ELIXSON, TIMOTHY L

BRYANT, ROSANNA

JOANN ELIXSON STEPHENS, AS PER

Not Classified By Court

ELIXSON, TIMOTHY LEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMSON, DAVID EARL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

02/26/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

02/26/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

02/26/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

02/26/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/26/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $934.00 Receipt Number MX 18476

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $9.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $905.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $9.00 Balance Remaining $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $905.00 Balance Remaining $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $934.00 Receipt Number MX 18465

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCompleted action date changed to 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCompleted set on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCompliance Pay Fine has been created with due date of 3/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase 632021CA000009CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williamson, David Earl