This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 02/01/2021 at 21:46:37 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS MYER, CHARLES

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MYER, CHARLES. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL, MITCHELL BISHOP and BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

MYER, CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

09/17/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

09/17/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/17/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

10/30/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

11/10/2020:ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/06/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/05/2020 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 11/5/2020 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 17704

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase 632020SC000131SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN