This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 02/01/2021 at 18:19:38 (UTC).

MATTOX, NOAH ALLEN VS MATTOX, MAGEN LYNN

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 MATTOX, NOAH ALLEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MATTOX, MAGEN LYNN. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FERRERO, DENISE RAE and DENISE FERRERO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FERRERO, DENISE RAE

DENISE FERRERO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MATTOX, NOAH ALLEN

Respondent

MATTOX, MAGEN LYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Hearing scheduled on 10/14/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge DENISE FERRERO presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEDIATION AND SCHEDULING STAUS CONFERNECE/FINAL HEARING VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE 9-3-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDISSOLUTION WAS FILED; HOWEVER SUMMONS NOT ISSUED BUT PAID FOR AS MR. MATTOX DID NOT HAVE MAGEN MATTOX ADDRESS FOR SERVICE; HE WAS ADVISED ONCE HE HAD AN ADDRESS HE COULD COME BACK AND A SUMMONS WOULD BE ISSUED AT THAT TIME.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED/DISCLAIMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number MX 17635

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCase 632020DR000110DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/2/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less