This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 06/25/2021 at 11:04:55 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS YOUNG, CAMILLE

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YOUNG, CAMILLE. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL, MITCHELL BISHOP and BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

YOUNG, CAMILLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/27/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

08/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

09/28/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

10/15/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

05/10/2021:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

06/23/2021:ORDER OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/08/2020 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 10/8/2020 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 17628

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCase 632020SC000123SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/27/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL