This case was last updated from Union County Courts on 07/29/2021 at 15:31:46 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS SPOONER, KEVIN J

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SPOONER, KEVIN J. This case was filed in Union County Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID, BISHOP, MITCHELL and MITCHELL BISHOP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SPOONER, KEVIN J

Lake Butler, FL 32054

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

07/19/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/19/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

07/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

COMPLAINT

07/19/2021:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/02/2021 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Union

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 9/2/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 19261

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCase 632021SC000122SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B