This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 02/01/2021 at 21:47:11 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS MOORE, JANE

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MOORE, JANE. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL, MITCHELL BISHOP and BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MOORE, JANE

Lake Butler, FL 32054-5753

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

09/15/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

09/15/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

RETURN OF SERVICE 10-23-2020

10/27/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE 10-23-2020

RETURN OF SERVICE 10-23-2020

10/31/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE 10-23-2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/05/2020 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE 10-23-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE 10-23-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 11/5/2020 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 17695

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCase 632020SC000129SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL