This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 07/20/2023 at 15:16:39 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS BARRICK, GLENN E

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARRICK, GLENN E. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL BISHOP, BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID and BISHOP, MITCHELL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MITCHELL BISHOP

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

BISHOP, MITCHELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BARRICK, GLENN E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREU, JUAN G

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/28/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

11/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/28/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF SERVICE 1-4-2023

01/06/2023:RETURN OF SERVICE 1-4-2023

ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION

01/17/2023:ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION

RETURN OF SERVICE (FOR JANUARY COURT DATE)

01/18/2023:RETURN OF SERVICE (FOR JANUARY COURT DATE)

ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE

03/16/2023:ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE

04/24/2023:ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION

05/04/2023:PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION

NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

05/17/2023:NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT 7-27-2023 @ 2:00 P.M.

05/22/2023:ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT 7-27-2023 @ 2:00 P.M.

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/26/2023:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

06/26/2023:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2023
  • HearingJudge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Case Management; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated Event Case Management on 7/27/2023 0200 PM Judge MITCHELL BISHOP results Cancelled on 6/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketEvent Case Management scheduled on 7/27/2023 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT 7-27-2023 @ 2:00 P.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • HearingJudge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Case Management; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Zoom H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 1/11/2023 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 21905

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase 632022SC000230SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less