This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 02/01/2021 at 16:37:10 (UTC).

HENDRICKS, BRYAN VS ROBINSON, CASEY

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 HENDRICKS, BRYAN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ROBINSON, CASEY. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL, MITCHELL BISHOP and BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENDRICKS, BRYAN

Defendant

ROBINSON, CASEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MCNAMARA, STEVEN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

09/08/2020:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

3 Day Notice

09/08/2020:3 Day Notice

RESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

09/08/2020:RESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS WITH ZOOM HEARING

09/08/2020:5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS WITH ZOOM HEARING

RETURN OF SERVICE 9-8-2020

09/14/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE 9-8-2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/15/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

EVICTION ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

09/15/2020:EVICTION ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

ORDER DENYING EVICTION

09/16/2020:ORDER DENYING EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/16/2020 10:00; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Hearing; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2; Defendant Attorney: MCNAMARA, STEVEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDefendant Attorney: Steven McNamara Assigned to CASEY ROBINSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE 9-8-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS WITH ZOOM HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket3 Day Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketActive Process Eviction Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 17654

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketEvent Hearing scheduled on 9/16/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCase 632020CC000126CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/8/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNAMARA, STEVEN ROBERT