This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 02/01/2021 at 18:19:22 (UTC).

GREEN, DALTON EDWARD VS SPANGLER, MIRANDA DANIELLE

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 GREEN, DALTON EDWARD filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SPANGLER, MIRANDA DANIELLE. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GROEB, ROBERT KIRK and DENISE FERRERO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

DENISE FERRERO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GREEN, DALTON EDWARD

Respondent

SPANGLER, MIRANDA DANIELLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event Hearing on 12/16/2020 1000 AM Judge DENISE FERRERO results Cancelled on 12/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketORDER CANCELING HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- MIRANDA SPANGLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF DL- MIRANDA SPANGLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketEvent Hearing scheduled on 12/16/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge DENISE FERRERO presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING BY ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketEvent Status Conference scheduled on 11/12/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge DENISE FERRERO presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEDIATION AND SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE/FINAL HEARING VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 17652

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCase 632020DR000113DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/4/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less