This case was last updated from Union County Courts on 07/24/2021 at 16:40:27 (UTC).

FEDDERMAN, DIANA, THOMAS, CLAUDE LESTER Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 FEDDERMAN, DIANA, THOMAS, CLAUDE LESTER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Union County Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROEB, ROBERT KIRK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FEDDERMAN, DIANA

Decedent

THOMAS, CLAUDE LESTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRENNER, SHERRI ADINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF CLAUDE LESTER THOMAS (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 19224

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to DIANA FEDDERMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE CHARLES CACACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE SANDRA MARY THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE CLAUDE LESTER THOMAS (E-FILED COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF CLAUDE LESTER THOMAS (E-FILED COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY,CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - CHRISTOPHER H THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY,CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - LISA CAGNO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCase 632021CP000019CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less