This case was last updated from Union County Courts on 02/19/2021 at 16:17:17 (UTC).

DUKES, CHRISTOPHER GAVIN VS MICHAEL, KELSIE LEIGH

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 DUKES, CHRISTOPHER GAVIN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MICHAEL, KELSIE LEIGH. This case was filed in Union County Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROEB, ROBERT KIRK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Union County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Union County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DUKES, CHRISTOPHER GAVIN

Respondent

MICHAEL, KELSIE LEIGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROGRAM FAMILY MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- CHRISTOPHER DUKES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- KELSIE MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE 1/21/21 AT 7:54PM

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 18254

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase 632021DR000016DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less