This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Union County on 07/08/2019 14:43:55

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Other case was filed by DANIELS, ROY O against ANDERSON, TONY in the jurisdiction of Eighth Circuit Courts - Union County, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Other
  • Jurisdiction Eighth Circuit Courts - Union County
  • Judge FERRERO, DENISE R
  • Courthouse Union County Courthouse
  • County Union
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff DANIELS, ROY O
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant YONN, J
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant ANDERSON, TONY
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ADDENDUMS

06/19/2019:NOTICE OF ADDENDUMS

Free with Subscription
INFORMATION SHEET SENT TO INMATE

06/14/2019:INFORMATION SHEET SENT TO INMATE

Free with Subscription
CRIMINAL OBSTRUCTION OF JUSTICE

06/14/2019:CRIMINAL OBSTRUCTION OF JUSTICE

Free with Subscription
COVER PAGE

06/14/2019:COVER PAGE

Free with Subscription
CLERK'S REVIEW OF PARTIES REQ FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCY

06/14/2019:CLERK'S REVIEW OF PARTIES REQ FOR DETERMINATION O...

Free with Subscription
APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

06/14/2019:APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT S...

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • ORDER TO PAY FILING FEE FOR FILE AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE
  • 06/19/2019
  • NOTICE OF ADDENDUMS
  • 06/14/2019
  • INFORMATION SHEET SENT TO INMATE
  • 06/14/2019
  • CLERK'S REVIEW OF PARTIES REQ FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCY
  • 06/14/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS
  • 06/14/2019
  • CRIMINAL OBSTRUCTION OF JUSTICE
  • 06/14/2019
  • COVER PAGE
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 632019CA000056CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.