This case was last updated from Union County Courts on 07/08/2019 15:31:13

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by COGGINS, WESLEY against RIZER, CHRISTY T in the jurisdiction of Union County Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Small Claim - Other Small Claim
  • Jurisdiction Union County Courts
  • Judge BISHOP, MITCHELL
  • Courthouse Union County Courthouse
  • County Union
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff COGGINS, WESLEY
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant RIZER, CHRISTY T
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Not Yet Classified NOBLITT, CHRISTY THIANNA
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/14/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

Free with Subscription
NOTICE TO APPEAR

06/14/2019:NOTICE TO APPEAR

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • Return of Service 6-27-19
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE TO APPEAR
  • 06/14/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM
  • 06/14/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 15412
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $175.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Active Process Pre-Trial Notice
  • 06/14/2019
  • Event Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 7/18/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 632019SC000119SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019
  • 07/18/2019
  • Event Date: 07/18/2019 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MX Room 208

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.