This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 06/22/2019 at 14:02:37 (UTC).

CLYATT, CURTIS LEO VS BASS, DAPHNE Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 CLYATT, CURTIS LEO filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BASS, DAPHNE. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL and MITCHELL BISHOP. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLYATT, CURTIS LEO

Defendants

BASS, JAMES WOODROW

BASS, DAPHNE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

05/29/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

3 Day Notice

05/29/2019:3 Day Notice

5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS

05/29/2019:5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS

RESPONSE FROM DAPHNE BASS

06/06/2019:RESPONSE FROM DAPHNE BASS

Return of Service 5-30-19

06/06/2019:Return of Service 5-30-19

ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING

06/07/2019:ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING

ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

06/18/2019:ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Hearing scheduled on 6/18/2019 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service 5-30-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE FROM DAPHNE BASS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5 - DAY EVICTION SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket3 Day Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 15312

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketActive Process Eviction Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCase 632019CC000107CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 06/18/2019 14:00; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Hearing; Location: MX Room 208

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less