Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Union County Courts on 04/15/2021 at 15:33:11 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS SHUMAN, JAMES C

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 CITIBANK N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHUMAN, JAMES C. This case was filed in Union County Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL, MITCHELL BISHOP and BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Union County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Union County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

SHUMAN, JAMES C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVRAR, FLYNN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

04/01/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

04/01/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

04/01/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

04/01/2021:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

04/01/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/01/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/06/2021 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 5/6/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 18700

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to CITIBANK N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase 632021SC000062SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.