This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 02/01/2021 at 21:58:17 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS WEILAND, CHERYL N

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WEILAND, CHERYL N. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL, MITCHELL BISHOP and BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

WEILAND, CHERYL N

Lake Butler, FL 32054-7318

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, JEFFREY LEE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

10/09/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

10/09/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/09/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/09/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

10/09/2020:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

12/10/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

12/10/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

12/11/2020:ORDER OF DISMISSAL

PLAINTIFFS SWORN MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

12/24/2020:PLAINTIFFS SWORN MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

01/12/2021:ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/04/2021 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 3/4/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to REOPENED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketReopened for Civil Other on 12/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS SWORN MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketReopen Date: 12/24/2020; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/10/2020 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to CAVALRY SPV I LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCase 632020SC000146SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/9/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAHN, JEFFREY LEE