This case was last updated from Union County Florida Courts on 06/24/2019 at 15:31:28 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA VS CHRISTMAS, DANIEL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHRISTMAS, DANIEL. This case was filed in Union County Florida Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL and MITCHELL BISHOP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

CHRISTMAS, DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAMS, ANSON ANDREW

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/31/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DANIEL CHRISTMAS

05/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO DANIEL CHRISTMAS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/31/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/31/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

06/06/2019:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 7/18/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 15324

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DANIEL CHRISTMAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketCase 632019SC000108SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 07/18/2019 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MX Room 208

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS , ANSON