This case was last updated from Union County Courts on 07/15/2021 at 15:33:19 (UTC).

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION VS CONNEY, THERRIS LEE Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CONNEY, THERRIS LEE. This case was filed in Union County Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID, BISHOP, MITCHELL and MITCHELL BISHOP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BISHOP, MITCHELL DAVID

BISHOP, MITCHELL

MITCHELL BISHOP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION

Defendants

DUNN, WILLIE

Lake Butler, FL 32054

CONNEY, THERRIS LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REISS, JENNIFER L

 

Court Documents

PLAINITFFS MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

06/15/2021:PLAINITFFS MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

06/15/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/15/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

06/15/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

SUMMONS ISSUED TO

06/15/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/15/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/05/2021 09:30; Judge: BISHOP, MITCHELL; Docket Type: Pre Trial Conference; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Room 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff Attorney: JENNIFER REISS Assigned to CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent Pre Trial Conference scheduled on 8/5/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MITCHELL BISHOP presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINITFFS MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $320.00 Receipt Number MX 19085

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCase 632021SC000102SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L