This case was last updated from Union County Courts on 07/02/2021 at 16:13:52 (UTC).

BUTLAND, KRYSTLE VS BUTLAND, PAUL

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 BUTLAND, KRYSTLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BUTLAND, PAUL. This case was filed in Union County Courts, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GROEB, ROBERT KIRK and ROBERT GROEB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

ROBERT GROEB

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BUTLAND, KRYSTLE

Respondent

BUTLAND, PAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent Case Management scheduled on 7/14/2021 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING HEARING 7/14/21 AT 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE 6/7/21 AT 1:10PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketANSWER, WAIVER, AND REQUEST FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRAIGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DL- WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number MX 19017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCase 632021DR000095DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less