This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Union County on 02/17/2021 at 14:44:52 (UTC).

ALCOTT, ROGER VS ADVANCED EYE CARE OF BAY COUNT Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 ALCOTT, ROGER filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ADVANCED EYE CARE OF BAY COUNT. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Union County, Union County Courthouse located in Union, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GROEB, ROBERT K and GROEB, ROBERT KIRK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Union County

  • Courthouse:

    Union County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Union, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GROEB, ROBERT K

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALCOTT, ROGER

Defendants

ADVANCED EYE CARE OF BAY COUNT

CORIZON HEALTH, INC.

CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC

HASTY, DR. BENJAMIN R

CONRIZON, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORDT, GREGORY MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

01/25/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/25/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $460.00 Receipt Number MX 18277

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $60.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff Attorney: Gregory Michael Nordt Assigned to ROGER ALCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCase 632021CA000003CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centurion of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases where Corizon Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NORDT, GREGORY MICHAEL