This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/11/2019 01:30:28

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 a Property - Other Eviction case was filed by WILSON, DAVID against LOVING, MICHAEL in the jurisdiction of Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Property - Other Eviction
  • Jurisdiction Sumter County Courts
  • Judge MILITELLO, PAUL
  • Courthouse Sumter County Courthouse
  • County Sumter
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Defendant LOVING, NANCY
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff WILSON, DAVID
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant LOVING, MICHAEL
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION APPOINTING COURT MEDIATION SERVICES SCHEDULING MEDIATION AND ASSESSING MEDIATION FEE
  • 07/03/2019
  • Payment received: $36.75 Receipt Number M 431926
  • 07/03/2019
  • Assessment 5 Total Assessed $36.75 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 07/03/2019
  • Assessment 5 assessed at sum $36.75
  • 07/03/2019
  • Payment received: $1,950.00 Receipt Number M 431925
  • 07/03/2019
  • Assessment 4 Total Assessed $1,950.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 07/03/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $1,950.00
  • 06/24/2019
  • Payment received: $40.80 Receipt Number M 431040
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 3 Total Assessed $40.80 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $40.80
  • 06/24/2019
  • Payment received: $2,220.00 Receipt Number M 431039
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $2,220.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $2,220.00
  • 06/24/2019
  • ANSWER ON TENANT EVICTION COMPLAINT FILED BY NANCY LOVING
  • 06/18/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE TO NANCY LOVING SERVED ON 06/17/19
  • 06/18/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO NANCY LOVING FOR MICHAEL LOVING SERVED ON 06/17/19
  • 06/17/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
  • 06/17/2019
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY
  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO NANCY LOVING
  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO MICHAEL LOVING

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.