This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 09/01/2022 at 01:34:43 (UTC).

WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P VS MCDOWELL, JONATHAN L

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MCDOWELL, JONATHAN L. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL and MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL

MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P

Defendant

MCDOWELL, JONATHAN L

Not Classified By Court

WILDWOOD PRESERVE APARTMENT HO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON, BARRY B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/29/2022

DocketCase Status set to CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

DocketANSWER ON TENANT EVICTION COMPLAINT FILED BY JONATHAN MCDOWELL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO JONATHAN L MCDOWELL SERVED ON AUGUST 12 2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO JONATHAN L MCDOWELL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 517278

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketPLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketCase 602022CC000874CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/9/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less