This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 10/29/2022 at 01:34:36 (UTC).

WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P VS DURANT, TANYEIKA D

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DURANT, TANYEIKA D. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE and MILITELLO, PAUL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE

MILITELLO, PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P

Defendant

DURANT, TANYEIKA D

Not Classified By Court

WILDWOOD PRESERVE APARTMENT HO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON, BARRY B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/24/2022

DocketCase Status set to CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2022

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2022

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022

DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY TO CLERK OF COURT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2022

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO TANYEIKA D DURANT SERVED ON OCT 12 2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO TANYEIKA D DURANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022

DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022

DocketPLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022

DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 521770

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022

DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022

DocketCase 602022CC001086CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/5/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less