This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 09/30/2022 at 01:33:04 (UTC).

WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P VS BERNABEL, CHRISTIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BERNABEL, CHRISTIE. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL and MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL

MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P

Defendants

PEREZ, GREGORY A

BERNABEL, CHRISTIE

Not Classified By Court

WILDWOOD PRESERVE APARTMENT HO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

JOHNSON, BARRY B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO CHRISTIE BERNABEL AND GREGORY A PEREZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO GREGORY A PEREZ SERVED ON SEPT 12 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO CHRISTIE BERNABEL SERVED ON SEPT 12 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO GREGORY A PEREZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO CHRISTIE BERNABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number M 519532

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase 602022CC000971CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less