Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/14/2019 at 05:30:39 (UTC).

WHITFIELD, DAVID A, WHITFIELD, PAMELA Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 WHITFIELD, DAVID A, WHITFIELD, PAMELA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WHITFIELD, PAMELA

Decedent

WHITFIELD, DAVID A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CURTIS, ANDREW MARC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT/CODICIL RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/SERVING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • Case Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Payment received: $7.00 Receipt Number M 438729

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • *ORIGINAL* LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH (**ORIGINAL**) -GERALDINE L. WHITFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2019
  • EFILED COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH -GERALDINE L. WHITFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH -DAVID A. WHITFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF TRUST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF TRUST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Case 602019CP000689CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CURTIS, ANDREW MARC