This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/11/2019 01:31:04

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 a Property - Other Eviction case was filed by TRUE INVESTMENTS LLC against HAMPTON, CHANTEL in the jurisdiction of Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 06/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Property - Other Eviction
  • Jurisdiction Sumter County Courts
  • Judge MILITELLO, PAUL
  • Courthouse Sumter County Courthouse
  • County Sumter
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Defendant HAMPTON, CHANTEL
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff TRUE INVESTMENTS LLC
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant UNKNOWN TENANT
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • COPY OF COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND SUMMONS MAILED TO CHANTEL HAMPTON &/OR UNKNOWN TENANT RETURNED UNDELIVERED
  • 06/18/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE TO UNKNOWN TENANT NKA KENYOTA BROWNE SERVED ON 06/17/19
  • 06/18/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO KENYOTA BROWNE FOR CHANGEL HAMPTON SERVED ON 06/17/19
  • 06/17/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
  • 06/17/2019
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY
  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO UNKNOWN TENANT
  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO CHANTEL HAMPTON
  • 06/17/2019
  • AUTHORIZATION FOR PROPERTY MANAGER
  • 06/17/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION
  • 06/17/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number M 430399
  • 06/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $205.00
  • 06/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00
  • 06/17/2019
  • Case 602019CC000433CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/17/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.