This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 08/19/2022 at 03:35:49 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS PARKER, THERESA

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PARKER, THERESA. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE and MILITELLO, PAUL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE

MILITELLO, PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

PARKER, THERESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS ISSUED TO THERESA PARKER

07/27/2022:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS ISSUED TO THERESA PARKER

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/19/2022 10:00; Judge: MILITELLO, PAUL; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketLETTER FOR RETURN OF NON SERVICE TO THERESA PARKER MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF NON SERVICE ON THERESA PARKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS ISSUED TO THERESA PARKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number M 516147

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCase 602022SC000804SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J