This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 09/12/2019 at 04:30:39 (UTC).

SQUIRE, ALEX KYLE VS SQUIRE, AUTUMN CHRISTINA

Case Summary

On 08/19/2019 SQUIRE, ALEX KYLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SQUIRE, AUTUMN CHRISTINA. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MORLEY, MICHELLE T and BARBARA KISSNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

BARBARA KISSNER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SQUIRE, ALEX KYLE

Respondent

SQUIRE, AUTUMN CHRISTINA

Not Classified By Court

ONDRISKA,

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 9/19/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge BARBARA KISSNER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • NOTICE REQUIRING COMPLIANCE PRIOR TO NEXT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • PROOF OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED BY RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • REQUEST BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DEMOGRAPHIC SHEET FOR BVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • NOTICE FOR FINAL HEARING/NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FILED BY AUTUMN SQUIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Payment received: $398.70 Receipt Number M 435342

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $1.20 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $397.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $1.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT IDENTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Case 602019DR000468DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less